House | 02/20/2023 | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety Finance and Policy | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Author added Huot | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Authors added Agbaje; Long | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Author added Pérez-Vega | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Author added Hortman | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |