|
04/27/2023
|
Secretary of State Chapter 31
|
|
|
|
04/27/2023
|
Governor's action Approval
|
|
|
|
04/27/2023
|
Secretary of State, Filed
|
|
|
|
04/27/2023
|
Governor approval
|
|
|
|
04/26/2023
|
Presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third reading as amended by the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Motion prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Motion to concur with Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Returned from Senate with amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Third reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Special Order: Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Author added Feist
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Comm report: To pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Introduction and first reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authors added Kraft and Rehm
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill was passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Author added Youakim
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 20, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Author added Pérez-Vega
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Author added Hollins
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Author added Hornstein
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Authors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger and Pursell
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Author added Curran
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
|
|
|