Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF430 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to transportation; establishing a special license plate for veterans who​
33 1.3 served as multinational peacekeepers in Beirut, Lebanon; amending Minnesota​
44 1.4 Statutes 2022, section 168.123, subdivision 2.​
55 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
66 1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 168.123, subdivision 2, is amended to read:​
77 1.7 Subd. 2.Design.The commissioner of veterans affairs shall design the emblem for the​
88 1.8veterans' special plates, subject to the approval of the commissioner, that satisfy the following​
99 1.9requirements:​
1010 1.10 (a) For a Vietnam veteran who served after July 1, 1961, and before July 1, 1978, in the​
1111 1.11active military service in a branch of the armed forces of the United States or a nation or​
1212 1.12society allied with the United States the special plates must bear the inscription "VIETNAM​
1313 1.13VET."​
1414 1.14 (b) For a veteran stationed on the island of Oahu, Hawaii, or offshore, during the attack​
1515 1.15on Pearl Harbor on December 7, 1941, the special plates must bear the inscription "PEARL​
1616 1.16HARBOR SURVIVOR."​
1717 1.17 (c) For a veteran who served during World War II, the plates must bear the inscription​
1818 1.18"WORLD WAR VET."​
1919 1.19 (d) For a veteran who served during the Korean Conflict, the special plates must bear​
2020 1.20the inscription "KOREAN VET."​
2121 1​Section 1.​
2222 REVISOR KRB/AD 23-01291​01/05/23 ​
2323 State of Minnesota​
2424 This Document can be made available​
2525 in alternative formats upon request​
2626 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
2727 H. F. No. 430​
2828 NINETY-THIRD SESSION​ 2.1 (e) For a combat wounded veteran who is a recipient of the Purple Heart medal, the​
2929 2.2plates must bear the inscription "COMBAT WOUNDED VET" and have a facsimile or an​
3030 2.3emblem of the official Purple Heart medal.​
3131 2.4 A member of the United States armed forces who is serving actively in the military and​
3232 2.5who is a recipient of the Purple Heart medal is also eligible for this license plate. The​
3333 2.6commissioner of public safety shall ensure that information regarding the required proof of​
3434 2.7eligibility for any applicant under this paragraph who has not yet been issued military​
3535 2.8discharge papers is distributed to the public officials responsible for administering this​
3636 2.9section.​
3737 2.10 (f) For a Persian Gulf War veteran, the plates must bear the inscription "GULF WAR​
3838 2.11VET." For the purposes of this section, "Persian Gulf War veteran" means a person who​
3939 2.12served on active duty after August 1, 1990, in a branch of the armed forces of the United​
4040 2.13States or a nation or society allied with the United States or the United Nations during​
4141 2.14Operation Desert Shield, Operation Desert Storm, or other military operation in the Persian​
4242 2.15Gulf area combat zone as designated in United States Presidential Executive Order No.​
4343 2.1612744, dated January 21, 1991.​
4444 2.17 (g) For a veteran who served in the Laos War after July 1, 1961, and before July 1, 1978,​
4545 2.18the special plates must bear the inscription "LAOS WAR VET."​
4646 2.19 (h) For a veteran who is the recipient of:​
4747 2.20 (1) the Iraq Campaign Medal, the special plates must be inscribed with a facsimile of​
4848 2.21that medal and must bear the inscription "IRAQ WAR VET" directly below the special​
4949 2.22plate number;​
5050 2.23 (2) the Afghanistan Campaign Medal, the special plates must be inscribed with a facsimile​
5151 2.24of that medal and must bear the inscription "AFGHAN WAR VET" directly below the​
5252 2.25special plate number;​
5353 2.26 (3) the Global War on Terrorism Expeditionary Medal, the special plates must be​
5454 2.27inscribed with a facsimile of that medal and must bear the inscription "GWOT VETERAN"​
5555 2.28directly below the special plate number; or​
5656 2.29 (4) the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal, the special plates must bear an appropriate​
5757 2.30inscription that includes a facsimile of that medal.​
5858 2.31 (i) For a veteran who is the recipient of the Global War on Terrorism Service Medal,​
5959 2.32the special plates must be inscribed with a facsimile of that medal and must bear the​
6060 2.33inscription "GWOT VETERAN" directly below the special plate number. In addition, any​
6161 2​Section 1.​
6262 REVISOR KRB/AD 23-01291​01/05/23 ​ 3.1member of the National Guard or other military reserves who has been ordered to federally​
6363 3.2funded state active service under United States Code, title 32, as defined in section 190.05,​
6464 3.3subdivision 5b, and who is the recipient of the Global War on Terrorism Service Medal, is​
6565 3.4eligible for the license plate described in this paragraph, irrespective of whether that person​
6666 3.5qualifies as a veteran under section 197.447.​
6767 3.6 (j) For a veteran who is the recipient of the Korean Defense Service Medal, the special​
6868 3.7plates must be inscribed with a facsimile of that medal and must bear the inscription​
6969 3.8"KOREAN DEFENSE SERVICE" directly below the special plate number.​
7070 3.9 (k) For a veteran who is a recipient of the Bronze Star medal, the plates must bear the​
7171 3.10inscription "BRONZE STAR VET" and have a facsimile or an emblem of the official Bronze​
7272 3.11Star medal.​
7373 3.12 (l) For a veteran who is a recipient of the Silver Star medal, the plates must bear the​
7474 3.13inscription "SILVER STAR VET" and have a facsimile or an emblem of the official Silver​
7575 3.14Star medal.​
7676 3.15 (m) For a woman veteran, the plates must bear the inscription "WOMAN VETERAN"​
7777 3.16and have a facsimile or an emblem as designated by the commissioners of veterans affairs​
7878 3.17and public safety.​
7979 3.18 (n) For a veteran who served as a multinational peacekeeper in Beirut, Lebanon, between​
8080 3.19August 1, 1982, and July 31, 1984, the plates must bear the inscription "MULTINATIONAL​
8181 3.20PEACEKEEPERS BEIRUT, LEBANON."​
8282 3​Section 1.​
8383 REVISOR KRB/AD 23-01291​01/05/23 ​