LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Minnesota MN
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF46
Action History
MN
Minnesota House Bill HF46
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session
Minnesota House Bill HF46
Action History
House
03/22/2023
Author added Curran
House
02/09/2023
Author added Smith
House
02/08/2023
Authors added Norris, Clardy, and Frazier
House
01/25/2023
Author added Berg
House
01/18/2023
Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety Finance and Policy
House
01/04/2023
Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law