|
03/17/2023
|
Secretary of State Chapter 18
|
|
|
|
03/17/2023
|
Governor's action Approval
|
|
|
|
03/17/2023
|
Secretary of State, Filed
|
|
|
|
03/17/2023
|
Governor approval
|
|
|
|
03/17/2023
|
Presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third reading as amended by the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Motion prevailed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Motion to concur with Senate amendments question recurred
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Motion to refuse to concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Motion to concur with Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Returned from Senate with amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Motion did not prevail
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Third reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Motion did not prevail to lay on table
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Special Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Comm report: To pass as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduction and first reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Received from House
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill was passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Point of order raised, ruled well taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Amendments offered
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Motion to lay on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported to the House
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 9, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Authors added Acomb, Tabke, Liebling, Noor, Hicks, Hortman, Sencer-Mura
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy
|
|
|