02/21/2023 | Secretary of State Chapter 9 | |||
02/21/2023 | Governor's action Approval | |||
02/21/2023 | Secretary of State, Filed | |||
02/21/2023 | Governor approval | |||
02/21/2023 | Presented to Governor | |||
House | 02/20/2023 | Returned from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Third reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Special Order | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF75 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Second reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF75, now on General Orders | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Received from House | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Author added Hussein | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Bill was passed | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Third reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 2, 2023 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Author added Hassan | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Authors added Pérez-Vega and Lislegard | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |