House | 03/07/2024 | Authors added Tabke and Elkins | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Author added Norris | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Author added Engen | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Author added Reyer | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Author added Moller | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Author added Bierman | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Author added Acomb | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Author added Hanson, J. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Human Services Policy | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |