House | 04/11/2023 | Author added Bierman | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Author added Myers | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Author added Curran | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Author added Demuth | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Author added Mueller | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Author added Daniels | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |