House | 04/25/2023 | Author added Pursell | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Author added Burkel | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Motion did not prevail | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Motion to suspend rules | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Author added Joy | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authors added Myers and Norris | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Authors added Skraba and Robbins | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Authors added Hudella, Hornstein, Knudsen, Kiel, and Perryman | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Author added Tabke | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Authors added Richardson and Wolgamott | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Author added Freiberg | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Author added Davis | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Author added Daniels | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Author added Torkelson | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Authors added Engen, Stephenson, Moller, and Hemmingsen-Jaeger | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Author added Garofalo | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Author added Acomb | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Authors added Bierman, Zeleznikar, and Dotseth | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance |