LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Minnesota MN
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF737
Action History
MN
Minnesota House Bill HF737
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session
Minnesota House Bill HF737
Action History
House
02/19/2024
Author added Clardy
House
03/13/2023
Author added Brand
House
02/06/2023
Authors added Norris and Klevorn
House
02/02/2023
Author added Hicks
House
01/30/2023
Authors added Curran; Hassan
House
01/23/2023
Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy