House | 03/20/2023 | Author added Coulter | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Author added Hussein | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Author added Curran | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Authors added Pelowski (as chief author) and Smith | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Author added Hollins | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Author added Sencer-Mura | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |