LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Minnesota MN
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF826
Action History
MN
Minnesota House Bill HF826
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session
Minnesota House Bill HF826
Action History
House
03/02/2023
Author added Lee, K.
House
03/02/2023
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
House
02/13/2023
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy
House
02/09/2023
Author added Schultz
House
01/30/2023
Author added Curran
House
01/25/2023
Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy