Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF14 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 01/25/2023

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to child care assistance; modifying child care assistance rates; appropriating​
1.3 money; amending Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 119B.13, subdivisions 1, 4.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 119B.13, subdivision 1, is amended to read:​
1.6 Subdivision 1.Subsidy restrictions.(a) Beginning November 15 August 7, 2021 2023,​
1.7the maximum rate paid for child care assistance in any county or county price cluster under​
1.8the child care fund shall be: the greater of the 75th percentile of the most recent child care​
1.9provider rate survey or the rates in effect at the time of the update. Thereafter, each rate​
1.10change is effective the first full service period on or after January 1 of the year following​
1.11the provider rate survey.​
1.12 (1) for all infants and toddlers, the greater of the 40th percentile of the 2021 child care​
1.13provider rate survey or the rates in effect at the time of the update; and​
1.14 (2) for all preschool and school-age children, the greater of the 30th percentile of the​
1.152021 child care provider rate survey or the rates in effect at the time of the update.​
1.16 (b) Beginning the first full service period on or after January 1, 2025, the maximum rate​
1.17paid for child care assistance in a county or county price cluster under the child care fund​
1.18shall be:​
1.19 (1) for all infants and toddlers, the greater of the 40th percentile of the 2024 child care​
1.20provider rate survey or the rates in effect at the time of the update; and​
1.21 (2) for all preschool and school-age children, the greater of the 30th percentile of the​
1.222024 child care provider rate survey or the rates in effect at the time of the update.​
1​Section 1.​
S0014-1 1st Engrossment​SF14 REVISOR DTT​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 14​NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: WIKLUND and Maye Quade)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​73​01/04/2023​
Referred to Health and Human Services​
Author added Maye Quade​116​01/09/2023​
Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance​01/25/2023​ 2.1The rates under paragraph (a) continue until the rates under this paragraph go into effect.​
2.2 (c) (b) For a child care provider located within the boundaries of a city located in two​
2.3or more of the counties of Benton, Sherburne, and Stearns, the maximum rate paid for child​
2.4care assistance shall be equal to the maximum rate paid in the county with the highest​
2.5maximum reimbursement rates or the provider's charge, whichever is less. The commissioner​
2.6may: (1) assign a county with no reported provider prices to a similar price cluster; and (2)​
2.7consider county level access when determining final price clusters.​
2.8 (d) (c) A rate which includes a special needs rate paid under subdivision 3 may be in​
2.9excess of the maximum rate allowed under this subdivision.​
2.10 (e) (d) The department shall monitor the effect of this paragraph on provider rates. The​
2.11county shall pay the provider's full charges for every child in care up to the maximum​
2.12established. The commissioner shall determine the maximum rate for each type of care on​
2.13an hourly, full-day, and weekly basis, including special needs and disability care.​
2.14 (f) (e) If a child uses one provider, the maximum payment for one day of care must not​
2.15exceed the daily rate. The maximum payment for one week of care must not exceed the​
2.16weekly rate.​
2.17 (g) (f) If a child uses two providers under section 119B.097, the maximum payment​
2.18must not exceed:​
2.19 (1) the daily rate for one day of care;​
2.20 (2) the weekly rate for one week of care by the child's primary provider; and​
2.21 (3) two daily rates during two weeks of care by a child's secondary provider.​
2.22 (h) (g) Child care providers receiving reimbursement under this chapter must not be​
2.23paid activity fees or an additional amount above the maximum rates for care provided during​
2.24nonstandard hours for families receiving assistance.​
2.25 (i) (h) If the provider charge is greater than the maximum provider rate allowed, the​
2.26parent is responsible for payment of the difference in the rates in addition to any family​
2.27co-payment fee.​
2.28 (j) (i) The maximum registration fee paid for child care assistance in any county or​
2.29county price cluster under the child care fund shall be set as follows: (1) beginning November​
2.3015, 2021, the greater of the 40th percentile of the 2021 child care provider rate survey or​
2.31the registration fee in effect at the time of the update; and (2) beginning the first full service​
2.32period on or after January 1, 2025, the maximum registration fee shall be the greater of the​
2​Section 1.​
S0014-1 1st Engrossment​SF14 REVISOR DTT​ 3.140th percentile of the 2024 child care provider rate survey or the registration fee in effect​
3.2at the time of the update. The registration fees under clause (1) continue until the registration​
3.3fees under clause (2) go into effect the greater of the 75th percentile of the most recent child​
3.4care provider rate survey or the registration fee in effect at the time of the update. Each​
3.5maximum registration fee update must be implemented on the same schedule as maximum​
3.6child care assistance rate increases under paragraph (a).​
3.7 (k) (j) Maximum registration fees must be set for licensed family child care and for child​
3.8care centers. For a child care provider located in the boundaries of a city located in two or​
3.9more of the counties of Benton, Sherburne, and Stearns, the maximum registration fee paid​
3.10for child care assistance shall be equal to the maximum registration fee paid in the county​
3.11with the highest maximum registration fee or the provider's charge, whichever is less.​
3.12 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
3.13 Sec. 2. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 119B.13, subdivision 4, is amended to read:​
3.14 Subd. 4.Rates charged to publicly subsidized families.Child care providers receiving​
3.15reimbursement under this chapter may not charge a rate to clients receiving assistance under​
3.16this chapter that is higher than the private, full-paying client rate. This subdivision shall not​
3.17prohibit a child care provider receiving reimbursement under this chapter from providing​
3.18discounts, scholarships, or other financial assistance to any clients.​
3.19 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
3.20 Sec. 3. APPROPRIATION; CHILD CARE ASSISTANCE PROGRAM.​
3.21 $30,735,000 in fiscal year 2024 and $56,498,000 in fiscal year 2025 are appropriated​
3.22from the general fund to the commissioner of human services for child care assistance​
3.23payments under Minnesota Statutes, section 119B.13, subdivision 1.​
3.24 Sec. 4. APPROPRIATION; BASIC SLIDING FEE PROGRAM.​
3.25 $31,468,000 in fiscal year 2024 and $41,412,000 in fiscal year 2025 are appropriated​
3.26from the general fund to the commissioner of human services for the basic sliding fee​
3.27program under Minnesota Statutes, section 119B.03. The base for this appropriation is​
3.28$46,171,000 in fiscal year 2026 and $42,952,000 in fiscal year 2027.​
3​Sec. 4.​
S0014-1 1st Engrossment​SF14 REVISOR DTT​ 4.1 Sec. 5. APPROPRIATION; OPERATIONS ADMINISTRATION.​
4.2 $151,000 in fiscal year 2024 and $157,000 in fiscal year 2025 are appropriated from the​
4.3general fund to the commissioner of human services for administration of the child care​
4.4assistance program and the basic sliding fee program. Of this amount, $18,000 in fiscal year​
4.52024 and $4,000 in fiscal year 2025 are for systems costs.​
4​Sec. 5.​
S0014-1 1st Engrossment​SF14 REVISOR DTT​