Senate | 04/13/2023 | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Author added Murphy | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Author added Fateh | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Referred to Labor | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Introduction and first reading |