Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF911 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/20/2023

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to transportation; governing policy provisions on school-related active​
1.3 transportation; amending Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 123B.90, subdivision​
1.4 2; proposing coding for new law in Minnesota Statutes, chapter 123B.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 123B.90, subdivision 2, is amended to read:​
1.7 Subd. 2.Student training.(a) Each district must provide public school pupils enrolled​
1.8in kindergarten through grade 10 with age-appropriate school bus safety training, as described​
1.9in this section, of the following concepts:​
1.10 (1) transportation by school bus is a privilege and not a right;​
1.11 (2) district policies for student conduct and school bus safety;​
1.12 (3) appropriate conduct while on the school bus;​
1.13 (4) the danger zones surrounding a school bus;​
1.14 (5) procedures for safely boarding and leaving a school bus;​
1.15 (6) procedures for safe street or road crossing; and​
1.16 (7) school bus evacuation.​
1.17 (b) Each nonpublic school located within the district must provide all nonpublic school​
1.18pupils enrolled in kindergarten through grade 10 who are transported by school bus at public​
1.19expense and attend school within the district's boundaries with training as required in​
1.20paragraph (a).​
1​Section 1.​
S0911-1 1st Engrossment​SF911 REVISOR KRB​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 911​NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: MORRISON, Dibble, Fateh, Port and Mann)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​524​01/30/2023​
Referred to Transportation​
Withdrawn and re-referred to Education Policy​928​02/20/2023​
Author added Mann​1147​02/27/2023​
Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation​03/20/2023​ 2.1 (c) Students enrolled in kindergarten through grade 6 who are transported by school bus​
2.2and are enrolled during the first or second week of school must receive the school bus safety​
2.3training competencies by the end of the third week of school. Students enrolled in grades​
2.47 through 10 who are transported by school bus and are enrolled during the first or second​
2.5week of school and have not previously received school bus safety training must receive​
2.6the training or receive bus safety instructional materials by the end of the sixth week of​
2.7school. Students taking driver's training instructional classes must receive training in the​
2.8laws and proper procedures when operating a motor vehicle in the vicinity of a school bus​
2.9as required by section 169.446, subdivisions 2 and 3. Students enrolled in kindergarten​
2.10through grade 10 who enroll in a school after the second week of school and are transported​
2.11by school bus and have not received training in their previous school district shall undergo​
2.12school bus safety training or receive bus safety instructional materials within four weeks​
2.13of the first day of attendance. Upon request of the superintendent of schools, the school​
2.14transportation safety director in each district must certify to the superintendent that all​
2.15students transported by school bus within the district have received the school bus safety​
2.16training according to this section. Upon request of the superintendent of the school district​
2.17where the nonpublic school is located, the principal or other chief administrator of each​
2.18nonpublic school must certify to the school transportation safety director of the district in​
2.19which the school is located that the school's students transported by school bus at public​
2.20expense have received training according to this section.​
2.21 (d) A district and a nonpublic school with students transported by school bus at public​
2.22expense may provide kindergarten pupils with bus safety training before the first day of​
2.23school.​
2.24 (e) A district and a nonpublic school with students transported by school bus at public​
2.25expense may also provide student safety education for bicycling and pedestrian safety, for​
2.26students enrolled in kindergarten through grade 5.​
2.27 (f) (e) A district and a nonpublic school with students transported by school bus at public​
2.28expense must make reasonable accommodations for the school bus safety training of pupils​
2.29known to speak English as a second language and pupils with disabilities.​
2.30 (g) (f) The district and a nonpublic school with students transported by school bus at​
2.31public expense must provide students enrolled in kindergarten through grade 3 school bus​
2.32safety training twice during the school year.​
2.33 (h) (g) A district and a nonpublic school with students transported by school bus at public​
2.34expense must conduct a school bus evacuation drill at least once during the school year.​
2​Section 1.​
S0911-1 1st Engrossment​SF911 REVISOR KRB​ 3.1 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective August 1, 2023.​
3.2 Sec. 2. [123B.935] ACTIVE TRANSPORTATION SAFETY TRAINING.​
3.3 Subdivision 1.Training required.(a) Each district must provide public school pupils​
3.4enrolled in kindergarten through grade 3 with age-appropriate active transportation safety​
3.5training. At a minimum, the training must include pedestrian safety, including crossing​
3.6roads.​
3.7 (b) Each district must provide public school pupils enrolled in grades 4 through 8 with​
3.8age-appropriate active transportation safety training. At a minimum, the training must​
3.9include:​
3.10 (1) pedestrian safety, including crossing roads safely using the searching left, right, left​
3.11for vehicles in traffic technique; and​
3.12 (2) bicycle safety, including relevant traffic laws, use and proper fit of protective​
3.13headgear, bicycle parts and safety features, and safe biking techniques.​
3.14 (c) A nonpublic school may provide nonpublic school pupils enrolled in kindergarten​
3.15through grade 8 with training as specified in paragraphs (a) and (b).​
3.16 Subd. 2.Deadlines.(a) Students under subdivision 1, paragraph (a), who are enrolled​
3.17during the first or second week of school and have not previously received active​
3.18transportation safety training specified in that paragraph must receive the safety training by​
3.19the end of the third week of school.​
3.20 (b) Students under subdivision 1, paragraph (b), who are enrolled during the first or​
3.21second week of school and have not previously received active transportation safety training​
3.22specified in that paragraph must receive the safety training by the end of the sixth week of​
3.23school.​
3.24 (c) Students under subdivision 1, paragraph (a) or (b), who enroll in a school after the​
3.25second week of school and have not received the appropriate active transportation safety​
3.26training in their previous school district must undergo the training or receive active​
3.27transportation safety instructional materials within four weeks of the first day of attendance.​
3.28 (d) A district and a nonpublic school may provide kindergarten pupils with active​
3.29transportation safety training before the first day of school.​
3.30 Subd. 3.Instruction.(a) A district may provide active transportation safety training​
3.31through distance learning.​
3​Sec. 2.​
S0911-1 1st Engrossment​SF911 REVISOR KRB​ 4.1 (b) A district and a nonpublic school must make reasonable accommodations for the​
4.2active transportation safety training of pupils known to speak English as a second language​
4.3and pupils with disabilities.​
4.4 Subd. 4.Model program.The commissioner of transportation must maintain a​
4.5comprehensive collection of active transportation safety training materials that meets the​
4.6requirements under this section.​
4.7 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective August 1, 2023.​
4​Sec. 2.​
S0911-1 1st Engrossment​SF911 REVISOR KRB​