Senate | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Received from House | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Bill was passed vote: 134-0 | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Third reading | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Committee report, to adopt | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |