Senate | 04/09/2025 | Referred to State and Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Received from House | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Bill was passed vote: 133-0 | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third reading | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 7, 2025 | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections Finance and Government Operations |