House | 04/07/2025 | Authors added Freiberg and Frazier | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Authors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger, McDonald | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Authors added Johnson, W.; Stephenson and West | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Authors added Momanyi-Hiltsley and Dippel | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Author added Pursell | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Author added Rehrauer | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |