House | 04/21/2025 | Author added Anderson, P. H. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Authors added Gillman, Robbins, Schwartz, Gordon, and Warwas | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Author added Witte | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Author added Mueller | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Author added Knudsen | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Author added Perryman | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Policy |