House | 04/24/2025 | Author added Hudson | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Author added Rehm | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Author added Olson | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Author added Coulter | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Authors added Virnig and Warwas | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Author added Nelson | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Author added Elkins | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Authors added Anderson, P. E.; Schwartz; Gordon; Smith; Rehrauer and Schultz | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |