House | 03/13/2025 | Bill was not passed vote: 67-66 | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Third reading | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Authors added Mueller and Roach | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Authors added Fogelman, Koznick, Stier, and Gordon | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Committee report, to adopt | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Authors added Franson, McDonald, Baker and Murphy | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Authors added Schultz; Engen; Perryman; Zeleznikar; Bennett; Anderson, P. H.; Bakeberg; Jacob; Robbins; Harder; Allen; Backer; Scott; Davids and Warwas | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |