Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF2419 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/14/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to natural resources; requiring life jackets for children aboard watercraft​
1.3 to have reflective material; amending Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 86B.501,​
1.4 subdivision 3.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 86B.501, subdivision 3, is amended to read:​
1.7 Subd. 3.Grant Allen Law; life jacket required for children.(a) No person may operate​
1.8a watercraft under way with a child under ten years of age aboard unless the child is:​
1.9 (1) wearing an appropriate personal flotation device approved under subdivision 1; or​
1.10 (2) below the top deck or in an enclosed cabin.​
1.11 (b) Paragraph (a) does not apply to commercial watercraft where the child is a passenger​
1.12and the operator is licensed by the state of Minnesota or the United States Coast Guard to​
1.13carry passengers for hire. Paragraph (a) also does not apply if the watercraft is anchored for​
1.14the purpose of swimming or diving.​
1.15 (c) A first violation of this subdivision prior to May 1, 2006, shall not result in a penalty,​
1.16but is punishable only by a safety warning.​
1.17 (d) Any (c) A violation other than a violation addressed in paragraph (c) of this​
1.18subdivision is to be considered a petty misdemeanor.​
1.19 (d) Beginning January 1, 2027, a personal flotation device required under this subdivision​
1.20must have at least 31 square inches of retroreflective material attached to its front side, at​
1.21least 31 square inches of retroreflective material on its back side, and, if the item is reversible,​
1.22at least 31 square inches of retroreflective material on each of its reversible sides. The​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR CKM/VJ 25-04485​02/28/25 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  2419​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Tabke, Stephenson and Fischer​03/17/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy​ 2.1retroreflective material attached on each side of the device must be divided equally between​
2.2the upper quadrants of the side, and the retroreflective material in each quadrant must be​
2.3attached as closely as possible to the shoulder area of the item.​
2.4 (e) Before May 1, 2028, and notwithstanding paragraph (c), a first violation of paragraph​
2.5(d) does not result in a penalty, but is punishable only by a safety warning.​
2​Section 1.​
REVISOR CKM/VJ 25-04485​02/28/25 ​