Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF2555 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/18/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to state government; establishing a state employee group insurance program​
1.3 utilization review pilot program; requiring reports.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. STATE EMPLOYEE GROUP INSURANCE PROGRAM UTILIZATION​
1.6REVIEW PILOT PROGRAM.​
1.7 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
1.8the meanings given.​
1.9 (b) "Enrollee" means an individual covered by a health plan offered through the state​
1.10employee group insurance program.​
1.11 (c) "Health carrier" means a nonprofit health service plan corporation operating under​
1.12Minnesota Statutes, chapter 62C, or health maintenance organization operating under​
1.13Minnesota Statutes, chapter 62D, with which the commissioner of management and budget​
1.14contracts for purposes of the state employee group insurance program.​
1.15 (d) "Health plan" means a health plan as defined in Minnesota Statutes, section 62A.011,​
1.16subdivision 3, that is offered through the state employee group insurance program.​
1.17 (e) "Medically necessary care" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.1862Q.53, subdivision 2.​
1.19 (f) "Prior authorization" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 62M.02,​
1.20subdivision 15.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR SS/ES 25-04111​03/06/25 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  2555​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Nadeau, Bierman, Liebling and Backer​03/20/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on State Government Finance and Policy​ 2.1 (g) "Retrospective utilization review" means the evaluation, after the provision of a​
2.2service or procedure or facility admission, of the necessity, appropriateness, and efficacy​
2.3of the health care service or procedure or facility admission by an individual or entity other​
2.4than the attending health care professional.​
2.5 (h) "State employee group insurance program" means the state employee group insurance​
2.6program under Minnesota Statutes, sections 43A.22 to 43A.31.​
2.7 Subd. 2.Pilot program established.The commissioner of management and budget​
2.8must establish and administer a utilization review pilot program under the state employee​
2.9group insurance program between January 1, 2026, and December 31, 2030, to evaluate the​
2.10efficacy, costs, and benefits of using retrospective utilization review as compared with using​
2.11prior authorization to evaluate the necessity, appropriateness, and efficacy of health care​
2.12services and procedures and facility admissions for enrollees. Under the pilot program,​
2.13health plans must use retrospective utilization review, and may but are not required to use​
2.14prior authorization, to evaluate the necessity, appropriateness, and efficacy of health care​
2.15services and procedures and facility admissions for enrollees. Under the pilot program,​
2.16retrospective utilization review and, if conducted, prior authorization must be conducted​
2.17according to the requirements and timelines for utilization review in Minnesota Statutes,​
2.18chapter 62M.​
2.19 Subd. 3.Quality and payment audits.During the pilot program, health carriers must​
2.20conduct quality and payment audits of retrospective utilization review determinations and​
2.21prior authorization determinations made under the pilot program to evaluate the effects of​
2.22the pilot program on enrollee access to medically necessary care and on payments to health​
2.23care providers and facilities for health care services and procedures and facility admissions.​
2.24 Subd. 4.Payment.(a) A health carrier may decline to pay a health care provider or​
2.25facility for a health care service or procedure or facility admission for which an adverse​
2.26determination is made and, if applicable, upheld on appeal.​
2.27 (b) A health care provider or facility must not bill an enrollee or guarantor for, or​
2.28otherwise seek to collect from an enrollee or guarantor, any amount for a health care service​
2.29or procedure or facility admission for which the enrollee's health carrier made an adverse​
2.30determination and that, if applicable, was upheld on appeal.​
2.31 Subd. 5.Termination.The commissioner of management and budget may terminate​
2.32the operation of the pilot program upon:​
2.33 (1) a determination by the commissioner that the pilot program is having a significant​
2.34negative impact on enrollee access to medically necessary care through the state employee​
2​Section 1.​
REVISOR SS/ES 25-04111​03/06/25 ​ 3.1group insurance program or on costs to enrollees or the state for health care provided through​
3.2the state employee group insurance program; and​
3.3 (2) provision of notice to health carriers and to the chairs and ranking minority members​
3.4of the legislative committees with jurisdiction over state government and health care, of the​
3.5commissioner's intent to terminate the operation of the pilot program. This notice must be​
3.6provided by July 1 of the calendar year prior to the year in which the commissioner intends​
3.7to terminate the pilot program.​
3.8Upon satisfaction by the commissioner of the requirements in clauses (1) and (2), the pilot​
3.9program shall cease operations on January 1 of the year following the year in which notice​
3.10was provided under clause (2).​
3.11 Subd. 6.Reports.The commissioner of management and budget, in collaboration with​
3.12the commissioner of health, must:​
3.13 (1) evaluate the impacts of the pilot program on the cost to enrollees and to the state for​
3.14health care provided under the state employee group insurance program and on enrollee​
3.15access to care and the quality of health care provided to enrollees;​
3.16 (2) develop recommendations on whether to continue the pilot program or expand the​
3.17pilot program to other populations; and​
3.18 (3) issue reports on these impacts and recommendations to the legislative committees​
3.19with jurisdiction over health care and state government by March 1, 2027, and March 1 of​
3.20each year thereafter through March 1, 2031.​
3​Section 1.​
REVISOR SS/ES 25-04111​03/06/25 ​