House | 03/11/2025 | Author added Franson | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Author added Huot | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Author added Witte | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Author added Zeleznikar | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Author added Tabke | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Author added Bakeberg | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce, Labor, and Economic Development Finance and Policy |