House | 03/10/2025 | Motion to lay on the table | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Motion prevailed | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Motion for reconsideration passage | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Bill was not passed | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Third reading | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Authors added Gillman and Sexton | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Author added Altendorf | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Author added Gander | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Authors added Rymer, McDonald, Baker, Koznick and Murphy | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Authors added Schultz; Duran; Perryman; Engen; Zeleznikar; Van Binsbergen; Knudsen; Burkel; Bennett; Dotseth; Anderson, P. H.; Hudson; Jacob; Davis; Robbins; Swedzinski; Johnson, W.; Harder; Allen; Gordon; and Scott | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Policy |