1.1 A bill for an act 1.2 relating to human services; requiring Tribally licensed residential substance use 1.3 disorder treatment providers to enroll in the substance use disorder demonstration 1.4 project; amending Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0759, subdivision 2. 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA: 1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0759, subdivision 2, is amended to read: 1.7 Subd. 2.Provider participation.(a) Programs licensed by the Department of Human 1.8Services as nonresidential substance use disorder treatment programs that receive payment 1.9under this chapter must enroll as demonstration project providers and meet the requirements 1.10of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2025. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this 1.11paragraph are ineligible for payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. 1.12 (b) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as residential treatment 1.13programs according to section 245G.21 that receive payment under this chapter must enroll 1.14as demonstration project providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1.151, 2024. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for 1.16payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. 1.17 (c) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as residential treatment 1.18programs according to section 245G.21 that receive payment under this chapter, are licensed 1.19as a hospital under sections 144.50 to 144.581, and provide only ASAM 3.7 medically 1.20monitored inpatient level of care are not required to enroll as demonstration project providers. 1.21Programs meeting these criteria must submit evidence of providing the required level of 1.22care to the commissioner to be exempt from enrolling in the demonstration. 1Section 1. REVISOR AGW/VJ 25-0516503/21/25 State of Minnesota This Document can be made available in alternative formats upon request HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES H. F. No. 3036 NINETY-FOURTH SESSION Authored by Knudsen and Schomacker04/02/2025 The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services Finance and Policy 2.1 (d) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as withdrawal management 2.2programs according to chapter 245F that receive payment under this chapter must enroll as 2.3demonstration project providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2.42024. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for payment 2.5for services provided under section 256B.0625. 2.6 (e) Out-of-state residential substance use disorder treatment programs that receive 2.7payment under this chapter must enroll as demonstration project providers and meet the 2.8requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2024. Programs that do not meet the requirements 2.9of this paragraph are ineligible for payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. 2.10 (f) Tribally licensed programs, except Tribally licensed residential treatment programs, 2.11may elect to participate in the demonstration project and meet the requirements of subdivision 2.123. The Department of Human Services must consult with Tribal Nations to discuss 2.13participation of nonresidential programs in the substance use disorder demonstration project. 2.14Tribally licensed residential treatment programs must enroll as demonstration project 2.15providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2028. Residential 2.16treatment programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for 2.17payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. 2.18 (g) The commissioner shall allow providers enrolled in the demonstration project before 2.19July 1, 2021, to receive applicable rate enhancements authorized under subdivision 4 for 2.20all services provided on or after the date of enrollment, except that the commissioner shall 2.21allow a provider to receive applicable rate enhancements authorized under subdivision 4 2.22for services provided on or after July 22, 2020, to fee-for-service enrollees, and on or after 2.23January 1, 2021, to managed care enrollees, if the provider meets all of the following 2.24requirements: 2.25 (1) the provider attests that during the time period for which the provider is seeking the 2.26rate enhancement, the provider took meaningful steps in their plan approved by the 2.27commissioner to meet the demonstration project requirements in subdivision 3; and 2.28 (2) the provider submits attestation and evidence, including all information requested 2.29by the commissioner, of meeting the requirements of subdivision 3 to the commissioner in 2.30a format required by the commissioner. 2.31 (h) The commissioner may recoup any rate enhancements paid under paragraph (g) to 2.32a provider that does not meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by July 1, 2021. 2Section 1. REVISOR AGW/VJ 25-0516503/21/25