LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Minnesota MN
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF35
Action History
MN
Minnesota House Bill HF35
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session
Minnesota House Bill HF35
Action History
House
03/06/2025
Author added Freiberg
House
03/05/2025
Authors added Tabke and Bierman
House
03/03/2025
Authors added Pinto, Moller, and Youakim
House
02/19/2025
Authors added Falconer and Kraft
House
02/13/2025
Authors added Stephenson and Hemmingsen-Jaeger
House
02/10/2025
Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy