House | 04/01/2025 | Author added Gottfried | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Author added Johnson, P. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Author added Sencer-Mura | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Author added Kraft | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Author added Virnig | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Authors added Norris, Tabke, Coulter, and Pinto | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |