Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF592 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/12/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to human services; requiring a report to the legislature on medical​
1.3 assistance, long-term services and supports, and other public assistance program​
1.4 applications.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. DIRECTION TO COMMISSIONER; CUSTOMER SERVICE SURVEY​
1.7AND REPORT ON APPLICATIONS FOR PUBLIC ASSISTANCE SERVICES.​
1.8 (a) The commissioner of human services shall work with lead agencies to develop a​
1.9customer service survey for medical assistance applicants and long-term services and​
1.10supports applicants by October 1, 2025. The customer service survey must be offered to​
1.11each individual applying for medical assistance or long-term services and supports between​
1.12November 1, 2025, and May 31, 2026, and must collect information on the applicant's​
1.13satisfaction with wait times and form complexity.​
1.14 (b) By November 1, 2026, the commissioner shall submit a report on medical assistance​
1.15applications and long-term services and supports applications, including recommendations​
1.16for legislative changes, to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative​
1.17committees with jurisdiction over human services. In preparing the report, the commissioner​
1.18must: (1) utilize information gathered from the direction to the commissioner in Laws 2017,​
1.19First Special Session chapter 6, article 1, section 51; (2) utilize information gathered from​
1.20the customer service surveys in paragraph (a); and (3) consult with lead agencies responsible​
1.21for administering medical assistance applications and long-term services and supports​
1.22applications throughout the state.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR AGW/RC 25-03504​02/07/25 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  592​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Quam​02/13/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services Finance and Policy​ 2.1 (c) The commissioner shall report findings and make legislative recommendations on​
2.2the following:​
2.3 (1) summarizing customer service survey results and trends;​
2.4 (2) reducing application and assessment times;​
2.5 (3) increasing efficacy of application, assessment, and reassessment training of lead​
2.6agency staff;​
2.7 (4) developing an expedited application process for applicants who previously resided​
2.8in neighboring states and received Medicaid or long-term services and supports;​
2.9 (5) developing applications for medical assistance and long-term services and supports​
2.10that automatically populate duplicate information;​
2.11 (6) using technology to efficiently manage caseloads, applications, assessments, and​
2.12reassessments;​
2.13 (7) aligning similar requirements for different public assistance services to reduce​
2.14application length and duplication;​
2.15 (8) developing best practices for lead agency staff to administer applications, assessments,​
2.16and reassessments to uniformly administer throughout the state;​
2.17 (9) developing unified points of intake, application, and eligibility determination for​
2.18public assistance services; and​
2.19 (10) identifying necessary federal waivers to implement any legislation recommendations.​
2.20 (d) The commissioner shall also report on the cost, time, and resources necessary to​
2.21develop a computerized interactive eligibility form that adapts to the applicant's answers to​
2.22reduce duplicative information when applying for related public assistance services​
2.23administered by the Department of Human Services and the Department of Children, Youth,​
2.24and Families.​
2​Section 1.​
REVISOR AGW/RC 25-03504​02/07/25 ​