House | 03/12/2025 | Motion prevailed | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Motion to lay on the table | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Authors added Gillman and Sexton | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Author added Altendorf | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Author added Gander | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Authors added McDonald, Rymer, Murphy and Koznick | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Authors added Duran; Perryman; Engen; Zeleznikar; Knudsen; Kresha; Burkel; Dotseth; Hudson; Lawrence; Jacob; Swedzinski; Robbins; Anderson, P. E.; Johnson, W.; Harder; Allen; Backer; and Scott | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |