05/06/2025 | Presented to Governor | |||
House | 04/28/2025 | Returned from Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Third reading Passed vote: 60-2 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Special Order | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Comm report: To pass | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Second reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Received from House | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Bill was passed vote: 114-15 | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Third reading | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Author added Huot | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Committee report, to adopt | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Author added Virnig | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Author added Hussein | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Author added Myers | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |