House | 04/07/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Author added Gander | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Authors added Curran, Virnig, and Agbaje | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Author added Greene | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Author added Hansen, R. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |