House | 03/13/2025 | Motion prevailed | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Motion to lay on the table | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Committee report, to adopt | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Author added Zeleznikar | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Author added Burkel | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Energy Finance and Policy |