Senate | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Received from House | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Bill was passed vote: 131-1 | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third reading | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Author added Repinski | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Second reading | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |