Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF2740 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/18/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to human services; establishing for certain customized living providers​
1.3 an exemption from the community living setting licensing moratorium and the​
1.4 commissioner's authority to manage statewide community living setting capacity;​
1.5 amending Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 245A.03, by adding a subdivision.​
1.6BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.7 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 245A.03, is amended by adding a subdivision​
1.8to read:​
1.9 Subd. 7a.Licensing moratorium exception; former customized living settings.(a)​
1.10Notwithstanding subdivision 7 and section 256B.493, if the commissioner determines that​
1.11the setting complies with all applicable rules and laws, the commissioner shall issue an​
1.12initial license for a community residential setting that was a customized living service setting​
1.13serving people under the brain injury or community access for disability inclusion waiver​
1.14plans under section 256B.49 in a single-family home and was operational on June 30, 2025.​
1.15"Operational" has the meaning given in section 256B.49, subdivision 28, paragraph (e).​
1.16 (b) The commissioner shall issue licenses under this subdivision for a licensed capacity​
1.17equal to the capacity of the customized living setting on June 30, 2025, not to exceed five.​
1.18 (c) Eligible applicants must apply for a community residential setting under this​
1.19subdivision by June 30, 2027.​
1.20 (d) The commissioner's authority under subdivision 7 and section 256B.493 to manage​
1.21statewide licensed community residential settings capacity, including the reduction and​
1.22realignment of licensed capacity of a community residential setting, does not apply to settings​
1.23licensed under this subdivision.​
1​Section 1.​
25-04648 as introduced​03/11/25 REVISOR DTT/CH​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 2740​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: FATEH)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​03/20/2025​
Referred to Human Services​ 2.1 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2025.​
2​Section 1.​
25-04648 as introduced​03/11/25 REVISOR DTT/CH​