Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF2747 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/18/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to transportation; employment and economic development; awarding​
1.3 construction mitigation grants to businesses affected by Trunk Highway 65​
1.4 construction; requiring a report; appropriating money.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. TRUNK HIGHWAY 65 CONSTRUCTION MITIGATION GRANTS.​
1.7 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
1.8the meanings given.​
1.9 (b) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of employment and economic development.​
1.10 (c) "Qualified business" means a business that employs up to 40 full-time or part-time​
1.11employees and experiences substantial business impacts as a result of the project.​
1.12 (d) "Substantial business impacts" means impairment of road access, parking, or visibility​
1.13for one or more qualified businesses as a result of the project, for a minimum period of one​
1.14month.​
1.15 (e) "Trunk Highway 65 construction project" or "project" means the construction work​
1.16to improve intersections along marked Trunk Highway 65 in the city of Blaine at 99th​
1.17Avenue Northeast; 105th Avenue Northeast; Anoka County State-Aid Highway 12, known​
1.18as 109th Avenue Northeast; and 117th Avenue Northeast, including the associated frontage​
1.19roads and backage roads within the trunk highway system.​
1.20 Subd. 2.Establishment.The commissioner, in consultation with the commissioner of​
1.21transportation, must award grants to qualified businesses that are negatively affected by the​
1​Section 1.​
25-04606 as introduced​03/07/25 REVISOR KRB/VJ​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 2747​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: KREUN, Gustafson, Bahr, Hoffman and Abeler)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​03/20/2025​
Referred to Transportation​ 2.1Trunk Highway 65 construction project for the purpose of maintaining the businesses during​
2.2the project.​
2.3 Subd. 3.Grant awards.(a) The commissioner must prioritize the awarding of each​
2.4grant on a case-by-case basis, including but not limited to the following criteria:​
2.5 (1) rate of decline in revenue;​
2.6 (2) duration of construction;​
2.7 (3) proximity to construction;​
2.8 (4) severity of traffic disruption; and​
2.9 (5) lack of access for pedestrian traffic.​
2.10 (b) When determining grant awards, the commissioner must consult with the​
2.11commissioner of transportation and with the business liaison designated for the project​
2.12under Minnesota Statutes, section 160.165.​
2.13 (c) Grant funds awarded under this section may be used for employee payroll expenses,​
2.14operating expenses, or facilities expenses. Grant awards must not be used for bonuses; new​
2.15equipment, furniture, or capital improvements; or construction or expansion.​
2.16 Subd. 4.Report.By January 15, 2027, and annually thereafter on January 15 until the​
2.17project is completed, the commissioner must submit a report on the grants awarded under​
2.18this section to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with​
2.19jurisdiction over employment and economic development and transportation finance and​
2.20policy. At a minimum, the report must include a complete list of grants awarded in the​
2.21previous calendar year, including business names and addresses, types of businesses, and​
2.22the amount of each award.​
2.23 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2025.​
2.24 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION.​
2.25 $5,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner​
2.26of employment and economic development for the grant awards under section 1.​
2.27Notwithstanding Minnesota Statutes, section 16B.98, subdivision 14, the commissioner​
2.28may retain up to two percent of this appropriation for administrative costs. This is a onetime​
2.29appropriation and is available until June 30, 2029.​
2.30 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2025.​
2​Sec. 2.​
25-04606 as introduced​03/07/25 REVISOR KRB/VJ​