Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF2787 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/18/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to education; requiring due process time for special education forms and​
1.3 procedures; establishing due process aid; appropriating money; proposing coding​
1.4 for new law in Minnesota Statutes, chapter 125A.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. [125A.081] DUE PROCESS DAYS AND AID.​
1.7 Subdivision 1.Due process forms and procedure days.Beginning with the 2025-2026​
1.8school year, a school district must use the revenue under this section to provide teachers​
1.9time to complete due process forms and procedures in accordance with the plan developed​
1.10under subdivision 2. This time is in addition to the preparation time under section 122A.50.​
1.11For purposes of this section, "school district" includes a charter school or cooperative unit​
1.12where teachers have an exclusive representative for purposes of collective bargaining.​
1.13 Subd. 2.Plan.(a) A district must meet and negotiate an agreement with the exclusive​
1.14representative of teachers in the district containing a plan to use the revenue authorized​
1.15under this section to provide teachers that provide direct services to students with​
1.16individualized education programs or individualized family services plans four contract​
1.17days each school year to complete due process forms and procedures. The four days must​
1.18be equally distributed throughout the school year. The plan must describe the district's​
1.19staffing plan for the days teachers are completing due process forms and procedures.​
1.20 (b) If the district and the exclusive representative cannot reach agreement on a staffing​
1.21plan for the four due process days, the agreement must require the district to use the revenue​
1.22for substitute teachers to replace the teachers completing due process forms and procedures​
1.23on due process days.​
1​Section 1.​
25-03973 as introduced​02/19/25 REVISOR CR/KR​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 2787​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: WESTLIN and Kunesh)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​03/20/2025​
Referred to Education Policy​ 2.1 Subd. 3.Due process aid.(a) A school district that enrolls students is eligible for due​
2.2process aid.​
2.3 (b) The Department of Education must calculate the statewide average cost of four​
2.4additional due process days for teachers providing direct services to students with​
2.5individualized education programs or individualized family services plans based on the​
2.6most recent available data. For fiscal year 2026, the department must convert that amount​
2.7to a statewide allowance per enrollee for school districts and an equivalent amount for each​
2.8cooperative unit. For fiscal year 2027 and later, the department must reduce the statewide​
2.9allowances established in 2026 by the statewide average amount of due process day expenses​
2.10added to eligible special education expenditures for the previous year.​
2.11 (c) The department must determine the fiscal year 2026 allowances by June 1, 2025,​
2.12and the fiscal year 2027 allowances by March 15, 2026. The department must establish the​
2.13allowances for fiscal years 2028 and later by March 15 of the previous year.​
2.14 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
2.15 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; SPECIAL EDUCATION DUE PROCESS AID.​
2.16 Subdivision 1.Department of Education.The sums indicated in this section are​
2.17appropriated from the general fund to the Department of Education for the fiscal years​
2.18designated.​
2.19 Subd. 2.Due process aid.For special education teacher due process aid under Minnesota​
2.20Statutes, section 125A.081:​
2026​.....​.......​2.21 $​
2027​.....​.......​2.22 $​
2.23 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2025.​
2​Sec. 2.​
25-03973 as introduced​02/19/25 REVISOR CR/KR​