Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF2905 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to transportation; establishing a qualification-based selection requirement​
33 1.3 for certain projects at the Department of Transportation; requiring reports;​
44 1.4 appropriating money.​
55 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
66 1.6 Section 1. QUALIFICATION-BASED SELECTION FOR ENGINEERING​
77 1.7SERVICES PILOT PROGRAM.​
88 1.8 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
99 1.9the meanings given.​
1010 1.10 (b) "Best value" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 16C.28, subdivision​
1111 1.111b.​
1212 1.12 (c) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of transportation.​
1313 1.13 (d) "Contractual threshold" means a project with consultant fees for engineering services​
1414 1.14in excess of $800,000 per project year.​
1515 1.15 (e) "Project" means an uncompleted road construction project where qualification-based​
1616 1.16selection services are utilized.​
1717 1.17 (f) "Qualification-based selection" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section​
1818 1.1816C.087, subdivision 2.​
1919 1.19 Subd. 2.Establishment.From October 1, 2025, to March 1, 2028, the commissioner​
2020 1.20must use qualification-based selection methods to determine the selection of engineering​
2121 1.21and design professionals on five or more projects in each year meeting the contractual​
2222 1.22threshold. The commissioner may use qualification-based selection methods across different​
2323 1​Section 1.​
2424 25-04672 as introduced​03/10/25 REVISOR KRB/AC​
2525 SENATE​
2626 STATE OF MINNESOTA​
2727 S.F. No. 2905​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
2828 (SENATE AUTHORS: JOHNSON STEWART, Koran and Carlson)​
2929 OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
3030 Introduction and first reading​03/24/2025​
3131 Referred to Transportation​ 2.1phases of an eligible project, including predesign, design, construction, and reconstruction.​
3232 2.2In selecting which five projects per year are subject to qualification-based selection, the​
3333 2.3commissioner must not use the same project or same phase of a project in a subsequent​
3434 2.4year.​
3535 2.5 Subd. 3.Preliminary report.By October 1, 2026, the commissioner must submit a​
3636 2.6preliminary report to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees​
3737 2.7with jurisdiction over transportation finance and policy. The report must contain information​
3838 2.8on the use of qualification-based selection methods by the Department of Transportation​
3939 2.9for certain road construction projects, including:​
4040 2.10 (1) a preliminary evaluation of the use of qualification-based selection methods;​
4141 2.11 (2) the development of criteria to determine eligible projects for which qualification-based​
4242 2.12selection is used;​
4343 2.13 (3) recommendations on whether legislative changes are necessary to increase the number​
4444 2.14of projects using qualification-based selection methods before expiration of the pilot program;​
4545 2.15and​
4646 2.16 (4) information detailing the use of qualification-based selection methods on selected​
4747 2.17projects, including the impact on:​
4848 2.18 (i) procurement timelines;​
4949 2.19 (ii) the quality of projects across all phases;​
5050 2.20 (iii) change orders; and​
5151 2.21 (iv) identified improvements to sustainability compared to best value engineering​
5252 2.22practices.​
5353 2.23 Subd. 4.Final report.By October 1, 2028, the commissioner must submit a final report​
5454 2.24to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with jurisdiction​
5555 2.25over transportation finance and policy on the use of qualification-based selection methods​
5656 2.26for eligible road construction projects. The final report must include updated information​
5757 2.27on the preliminary report submitted under subdivision 3 and must include:​
5858 2.28 (1) the commissioner's recommended number of projects for which qualification-based​
5959 2.29selection methods are to be used;​
6060 2.30 (2) a cost benefit analysis on the use of qualification-based selection methods compared​
6161 2.31to best value engineering practices for eligible projects under the pilot program; and​
6262 2​Section 1.​
6363 25-04672 as introduced​03/10/25 REVISOR KRB/AC​ 3.1 (3) any legislative recommendations to implement a higher number of qualification-based​
6464 3.2selection methods or require the use of those methods for all road construction projects over​
6565 3.3a certain contractual threshold for engineering services.​
6666 3.4 Subd. 5.Expiration.This section expires January 15, 2029, or upon submission of the​
6767 3.5final report in subdivision 4, whichever is sooner.​
6868 3.6 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
6969 3.7 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION.​
7070 3.8 $....... in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of​
7171 3.9transportation for the use of qualification-based selection methods and preparation of the​
7272 3.10legislative reports by the Department of Transportation in section 1. This is a onetime​
7373 3.11appropriation and is available until June 30, 2029.​
7474 3​Sec. 2.​
7575 25-04672 as introduced​03/10/25 REVISOR KRB/AC​