1 | 1 | | 1.1 A bill for an act |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1.2 relating to higher education; requiring a report; canceling an appropriation; |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1.3 appropriating money for amyotrophic lateral sclerosis research; repealing Laws |
---|
4 | 4 | | 1.4 2022, chapter 42, section 2, as amended. |
---|
5 | 5 | | 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA: |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1.6 Section 1. APPROPRIATION; ALS RESEARCH. |
---|
7 | 7 | | 1.7 (a) Of the amount appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of the Office |
---|
8 | 8 | | 1.8of Higher Education pursuant to Laws 2022, chapter 42, section 2, paragraph (b), as amended |
---|
9 | 9 | | 1.9by Laws 2024, chapter 124, article 1, section 1, and Laws 2024, chapter 127, article 34, |
---|
10 | 10 | | 1.10section 1, $15,000,000 is canceled. |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1.11 (b) $15,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the Board |
---|
12 | 12 | | 1.12of Regents of the University of Minnesota for a collaborative partnership with the Mayo |
---|
13 | 13 | | 1.13Clinic to engage in ongoing research into amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS), with the goal |
---|
14 | 14 | | 1.14of bettering the lives of individuals with ALS and finding a cure for the disease. This is a |
---|
15 | 15 | | 1.15onetime appropriation. Notwithstanding Minnesota Statutes, section 16A.28, unencumbered |
---|
16 | 16 | | 1.16balances under this section do not cancel until June 30, 2029. |
---|
17 | 17 | | 1.17 (c) Beginning January 15, 2026, and annually thereafter until January 15, 2030, or until |
---|
18 | 18 | | 1.18the funds are fully expended, whichever occurs first, the Board of Regents of the University |
---|
19 | 19 | | 1.19of Minnesota must submit a report to the legislature specifying how funds appropriated |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1.20under this section have been used by the collaborative partnership. |
---|
21 | 21 | | 1Section 1. |
---|
22 | 22 | | 25-05066 as introduced03/21/25 REVISOR VH/EH |
---|
23 | 23 | | SENATE |
---|
24 | 24 | | STATE OF MINNESOTA |
---|
25 | 25 | | S.F. No. 3155NINETY-FOURTH SESSION |
---|
26 | 26 | | (SENATE AUTHORS: HOFFMAN, Abeler, Dibble, Utke and Hawj) |
---|
27 | 27 | | OFFICIAL STATUSD-PGDATE |
---|
28 | 28 | | Introduction and first reading04/01/2025 |
---|
29 | 29 | | Referred to Higher Education 2.1 Sec. 2. REPEALER. |
---|
30 | 30 | | 2.2 Laws 2022, chapter 42, section 2, as amended by Laws 2024, chapter 124, article 1, |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2.3section 1, Laws 2024, chapter 127, article 34, section 1, is repealed. |
---|
32 | 32 | | 2Sec. 2. |
---|
33 | 33 | | 25-05066 as introduced03/21/25 REVISOR VH/EH Laws 2022, chapter 42, section 2, as amended by Laws 2024, chapter 124, article 1, section 1; as |
---|
34 | 34 | | amended by Laws 2024, chapter 127, article 34, section 1 |
---|
35 | 35 | | Section 1. Laws 2022, chapter 42, section 2, is amended to read: |
---|
36 | 36 | | Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; ALS RESEARCH. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (a) $396,000 in fiscal year 2023 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of |
---|
38 | 38 | | the Office of Higher Education to award competitive grants to applicants for research into |
---|
39 | 39 | | amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS). The commissioner may work with the Minnesota Department |
---|
40 | 40 | | of Health to administer the grant program, including identifying clinical and translational research |
---|
41 | 41 | | and innovations, developing outcomes and objectives with the goal of bettering the lives of |
---|
42 | 42 | | individuals with ALS and finding a cure for the disease, and application review and grant recipient |
---|
43 | 43 | | selection. Not more than $396,000 may be used by the commissioner to administer the grant program. |
---|
44 | 44 | | This is a onetime appropriation. Notwithstanding Minnesota Statutes, section 16A.28, unencumbered |
---|
45 | 45 | | balances under this section do not cancel until June 30, 2026. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (b) $19,604,000 in fiscal year 2024 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner |
---|
47 | 47 | | of the Office of Higher Education to award competitive grants to applicants for research into |
---|
48 | 48 | | amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS). The commissioner may work with the Minnesota Department |
---|
49 | 49 | | of Health to administer the grant program, including identifying clinical and translational research |
---|
50 | 50 | | and innovations, developing outcomes and objectives with the goal of bettering the lives of |
---|
51 | 51 | | individuals with ALS and finding a cure for the disease, and application review and grant recipient |
---|
52 | 52 | | selection. Up to $15,000,000 may be used by the commissioner for grants to the Amyotrophic |
---|
53 | 53 | | Lateral Sclerosis Association, Never Surrender, or other similar organizations to award and administer |
---|
54 | 54 | | competitive grants to applicants for research into ALS under this section. This is a onetime |
---|
55 | 55 | | appropriation. Notwithstanding Minnesota Statutes, section 16A.28, unencumbered balances under |
---|
56 | 56 | | this section do not cancel until June 30, 2029. Notwithstanding Minnesota Statutes, section 16B.98, |
---|
57 | 57 | | subdivision 14, the commissioner, the Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Association, Never Surrender, |
---|
58 | 58 | | and other similar organizations may use up to a total of five percent of this appropriation for |
---|
59 | 59 | | administrative costs. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (c) Grants shall be awarded to support clinical and translational research related to ALS. Research |
---|
61 | 61 | | topics may include but are not limited to environmental factors, disease mechanisms, disease models, |
---|
62 | 62 | | biomarkers, drug development, clinical studies, precision medicine, medical devices, assistive |
---|
63 | 63 | | technology, and cognitive studies. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (d) Eligible applicants for the grants are research facilities, universities, and health systems |
---|
65 | 65 | | located in Minnesota. Applicants must submit proposals to the commissioner in the time, form, and |
---|
66 | 66 | | manner established by the commissioner. Applicants may coordinate research endeavors and submit |
---|
67 | 67 | | a joint application. When reviewing the proposals, the commissioner shall make an effort to avoid |
---|
68 | 68 | | approving a grant for an applicant whose research is duplicative of an existing grantee's research. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (e) Beginning January 15, 2023, and annually thereafter until January 15, 2030, the commissioner |
---|
70 | 70 | | shall submit a report to the legislature specifying the applicants receiving grants under this section, |
---|
71 | 71 | | the amount of each grant, the purposes for which the grant funds were used, and the amount of the |
---|
72 | 72 | | appropriation that is unexpended. The report must also include relevant findings, results, and |
---|
73 | 73 | | outcomes of the grant program, and any other information which the commissioner deems significant |
---|
74 | 74 | | or useful. |
---|
75 | 75 | | EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment. |
---|
76 | 76 | | 1R |
---|
77 | 77 | | APPENDIX |
---|
78 | 78 | | Repealed Minnesota Session Laws: 25-05066 |
---|