Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF3324 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/04/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to transportation; modifying due date of a legislative report prepared by​
1.3 the Center of Transportation Studies at the University of Minnesota; amending​
1.4 Laws 2023, chapter 68, article 4, section 109.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. Laws 2023, chapter 68, article 4, section 109, is amended to read:​
1.7 Sec. 109. TRAFFIC SAFETY VIOLATIONS DISPOSITION ANALYSIS.​
1.8 (a) The commissioner of public safety must enter into an agreement with the Center for​
1.9Transportation Studies at the University of Minnesota to conduct an evaluation of the​
1.10disposition in recent years of citations for speeding, impairment, distraction, and seatbelt​
1.11violations. The evaluation under the agreement must include but is not limited to analysis​
1.12of:​
1.13 (1) rates of citations issued compared to rates of citations contested in court and the​
1.14outcomes of the cases;​
1.15 (2) amounts of fines imposed compared to counts and amounts of fine payments; and​
1.16 (3) any related changes in patterns of traffic enforcement from 2017 to 2022.​
1.17 (b) The agreement must require the Center for Transportation Studies to submit an​
1.18interim progress report by July 1, 2024, and a final report by July 1, 2025 January 15, 2026,​
1.19to the commissioner and the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative​
1.20committees with jurisdiction over transportation policy and finance and public safety.​
1.21 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
1​Section 1.​
25-05348 as introduced​03/31/25 REVISOR KRB/CH​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 3324​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: JOHNSON STEWART and Dibble)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​04/07/2025​
Referred to Transportation​