Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF3465 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/29/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to taxation; sales and use; providing a refundable exemption for​
1.3 construction materials for a community center in the city of Dilworth.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. CITY OF DILWORTH; SALES TAX EXEMPTION FOR​
1.6CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS.​
1.7 Subdivision 1.Exemption; refund.(a) Materials and supplies used or consumed in and​
1.8equipment incorporated into the construction, reconstruction, upgrade, expansion, renovation,​
1.9or remodeling of a community center in the city of Dilworth are exempt from sales and use​
1.10tax under Minnesota Statutes, chapter 297A, provided that the materials, supplies, and​
1.11equipment are purchased after December 31, 2024, and before July 1, 2027.​
1.12 (b) The tax must be imposed and collected as if the rate under Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.13297A.62, subdivisions 1 and 1a, applied and then refunded in the same manner provided​
1.14for projects under Minnesota Statutes, section 297A.75, except that the applicant must be​
1.15the governmental entity that owns or contracts for the project. Refunds for eligible purchases​
1.16must not be issued until after June 30, 2025.​
1.17 Subd. 2.Appropriation.The amount required to pay the refunds under subdivision 1​
1.18is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of revenue.​
1.19 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective retroactively for sales and purchases​
1.20made after December 31, 2024, and before July 1, 2027.​
1​Section 1.​
25-05515 as introduced​04/21/25 REVISOR EAP/NS​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 3465​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: KUPEC)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​04/30/2025​
Referred to Taxes​