Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF48 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/14/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to taxation; sales and use; providing a refundable exemption for​
1.3 construction materials used in certain projects in the Russell Tyler Ruthton​
1.4 Independent School District.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. RUSSELL TYLER RUTHTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;​
1.7SALES AND USE TAX EXEMPTION FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS.​
1.8 Subdivision 1.Exemption; refund.(a) Materials and supplies used or consumed in and​
1.9equipment incorporated into the construction of a prekindergarten through grade 12 school​
1.10building and athletic field in Independent School District No. 2902, Russell Tyler Ruthton,​
1.11are exempt from sales and use tax imposed under Minnesota Statutes, chapter 297A, if the​
1.12materials, supplies, and equipment were purchased after December 31, 2019, and before​
1.13January 1, 2024.​
1.14 (b) The tax must be imposed and collected as if the rate under Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.15297A.62, subdivisions 1 and 1a, applied and then refunded in the same manner provided​
1.16for projects under Minnesota Statutes, section 297A.75, subdivision 1, clause (17).​
1.17Notwithstanding Minnesota Statutes, section 289A.40, claims for refunds for sales and​
1.18purchases made after December 31, 2019, and before January 1, 2022, may be filed until​
1.19January 1, 2026.​
1.20 Subd. 2.Appropriation.The amount required to pay the refunds under subdivision 1​
1.21is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of revenue.​
1.22 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective retroactively for sales and purchases​
1.23made after December 31, 2019, and before January 1, 2024.​
1​Section 1.​
25-00955 as introduced​12/13/24 REVISOR EAP/LN​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 48​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: WEBER and Dahms)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​01/16/2025​
Referred to Taxes​