Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF97 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/14/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to education; amending exemption requirements for American Indian​
1.3 mascots; amending Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 121A.041, subdivision 3.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 121A.041, subdivision 3, is amended to read:​
1.6 Subd. 3.Exemption.A public school may seek an exemption to subdivision 2 by​
1.7submitting a request in writing to all 11 federally recognized Tribal Nations in Minnesota​
1.8and to the Tribal Nations Education Committee by September 1, 2023. The exemption is​
1.9denied if any of the 11 Tribal Nations or the Tribal Nations Education Committee oppose​
1.10the exemption by December 15, 2023. A public school whose request for an exemption is​
1.11denied must comply with subdivision 2 by September 1, 2026 is exempt from the prohibition​
1.12in subdivision 2 if an American Indian Tribe located in the same county as the public school​
1.13does not object to the use of an American Indian mascot. If an American Indian Tribe does​
1.14not exist in the same county as the public school, the public school is exempt from the​
1.15prohibition in subdivision 2.​
1​Section 1.​
25-01493 as introduced​12/19/24 REVISOR CR/BM​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 97​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: WESTROM, Drazkowski, Rarick and Koran)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​01/16/2025​
Referred to Education Policy​