House
|
10/05/2022
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2022
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2022
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2022
|
H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2022
|
HCS H defeated
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2022
|
Taken up for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2022
|
Executive Session Conducted H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
Executive Session Conducted H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Budget
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Budget
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Budget
|
|
|
House
|
09/22/2022
|
Referred H Budget
|
|
|
House
|
09/22/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
09/21/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2022
|
Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2022
|
Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2022
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2022
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2022
|
SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hough)--(5974S.05F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2022
|
Reported from S Appropriations Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 3 & 5) Appropriations Committee (5974S.04C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|