Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 20, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second read and referred: Health and Pensions(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Referred: Pensions(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|