Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 30, 2022
Fiscal Note January 13, 2022
Bill December 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis January 31, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022
Analysis December 13, 2021