Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 6, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 2, 2022, 1:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|