LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2106
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2106
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2106
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
March 6, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 22, 2022
Bill
December 29, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
March 3, 2022
Compare
Analysis
March 3, 2022
Analysis
January 7, 2022