Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 13, 2022
Fiscal Note April 4, 2022
Bill January 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022