House | 02/28/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Referred: Workforce Development(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |